To multiply a quantity by 10, 100 or 1000, we have to depend the variety of zeros within the multiplier and write the identical variety of zeros to the fitting of the multiplier.

Guidelines for multiplying by 10, 100 and 1000:

**Multiply by 10: **

If we multiply an integer by 10, we write a zero on the finish of the multiplier.

**For instance:**

1275 × 10 = 12750

**Multiply With Them:**

To multiply by them, kind a zero (0) on the finish of the multiplication and multiply the remaining numbers.

**Multiply by 100: **

If we multiply an integer by 100, we write two zeros on the finish of the multiplier.

**For instance:**

1275 × 100 = 127500

**Multiply by Faces:**

To multiply by tons of, kind two zeros (00) on the finish and multiply the remaining numbers.

**Multiply by 1000: **If we multiply an integer by 1000, we write three zeros on the finish of the multiplier.

**For instance:**

1275 × 1000 = 1275000

**Multiply by a thousand:**

To multiply by hundreds, kind three zeros (000) on the finish and multiply the remaining numbers.

**● **To multiply a quantity by an element that’s the zero and non-zero a part of the issue, we put within the product as many zeros because the multiplier, after which multiply the quantity by the nonzero half.

**For instance:**

1275 × 20 = 25500

1275 × 300 = 382500

1275 × 5000 = 6375000

You possibly can even hold the chart above for additional reference.

Multiplication by Ten, Hundred, and Thousand Questions and Solutions

**1. Evaluate the wheels supplied by writing the product within the outermost circle.**

(I)

**Solutions:**

(ii)

**Solutions:**

(iii)

**Solutions:**

(iv)

**Solutions:**

**2. Multiply and write the product within the outermost circle.**

(I)

**Reply:**

(ii)

**Reply:**

(iii)

**Reply:**

**2. Discover the lacking multiplier in every of the questions beneath.**

(i) ……………… × 40 = 36000

(ii) ……………… × 500 = 7500000

(iii) ……………… × 700 = 77000000

(iv) ……………… × 9000 = 81000

(v) ……………… × 80000 = 96000000

**Solutions:**

(i) 900

(ii) 15000

(iii) 110000

(iv) 9

(v) 1200

**3. Fill within the blanks.**

(i) 17 × 10 = __________

(ii) 68 × __________ = 68000

(iii) 25 × 100 = __________

(iv) 100 × __________ = 22500

(v) 23 × 1000 = __________

(vi) __________ × 10 = 8900

(vii) 24 × 10 = __________

(viii) __________ × 1000 = 40000

(ix) 31 × 100 = __________

(x) __________ × 1000 = 48000

(xi) 78 × 1000 = __________

(xii) __________ × 18 = 18000

(xiii) 16 × __________ = 1600

(xiv) 100 × __________ = 68200

(xv) __________ × 42 = 420

(xvi) __________ × 115 = 11500

(xvii) 723 × __________ = 7230

(xviii) __________ × 1000 = 27000

(xix) __________ × 807 = 8070

(xx) __________ × 100 = 50900

(xxi) 1000 × __________ = 63000

(xxii) 999 × 100 = __________

**Reply:**

(i) 170

(ii) 1000

(iii) 2500

(iv) 225

(v) 23000

(vi) 890

(vii) 240

(viii) 40

(ix) 3100

(x) 48

(xi) 78000

(xii) 1000

(xiii) 100

(xiv) 682

(xv) 10

(xvi) 100

(xvii) 10

(xviii) 27

(xix) 10

(xx) 509

(xxi) 63

(xxii) 99900

**● Operations with Integers**

**fifth Grade Math issues**

**Multiply by Ten, Hundred and Thousand to HOME**

**Did not discover what you have been on the lookout for? Or I wish to know extra about Simply Math Arithmetic.
Use this Google Search to search out what you want.**

#Multiplication #Ten #Thousand #Multiply