# Multiply 2-Dig Numbers by 2-Dig Numbers |Multiply 2-Dig Numbers

We are going to study to multiply 2-digit numbers by 2-digit numbers.

Multiplication 2 Digit Numbers × 2 Digits:

I. Multiply 44 by 18.

 T HE 4 4 × 1 8 3 5 2 one. + 4 4 0 2. 7 9 2 3. one. 18 = 1 ten and eight ones Multiply 8 by each numbers 44 × 8 = 352 one 2. Multiply 1 ten by each numbers 44 × 1 44 tens = 440 tens 3. Add the 2 merchandise 352 + 440 = 792

 T HE 3 2 × 2 3 9 6 one. + 6 4 2. 7 3 6 3. one. 23 = 2 tens and three ones Multiply 3 by each numbers 32 × 3 = 96 grains 2. Multiply 2 tens by each numbers 32 x 2 = 64 tens = 6 hundred, 4 tens 3. Add the 2 merchandise and write as – 96 + 640 = 736

1. Multiply the Following 2 Digits:

 (I) H T HE 2 4 × 1 1 ____________ ____________ ____________ (ii) H T HE 3 4 × 1 2 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (iii) H T HE 2 9 × 1 3 ____________ ____________ ____________ (iv) H T HE 4 1 × 1 4 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (v) H T HE 5 2 × 1 5 ____________ ____________ ____________ (vi) H T HE 4 1 × 1 7 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (vii) H T HE 2 9 × 1 8 ____________ ____________ ____________ (viii) H T HE 4 4 × 2 0 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (ix) H T HE 4 1 × 2 2 ____________ ____________ ____________ (X) H T HE 5 1 × 2 9 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (ix) H T HE 9 6 × 3 1 ____________ ____________ ____________ (X) H T HE 3 5 × 4 1 ____________ ____________ ____________

2. Multiply the two Digit Numbers Given by the two Digit Numbers:

 (I) H T HE 8 3 × 1 2 ____________ ____________ ____________ (ii) H T HE 2 9 × 1 5 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (iii) H T HE 4 2 × 1 8 ____________ ____________ ____________ (iv) H T HE 3 2 × 1 3 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (v) H T HE 7 3 × 1 0 ____________ ____________ ____________ (vi) H T HE 6 6 × 1 0 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (vii) H T HE 5 4 × 1 4 ____________ ____________ ____________ (viii) H T HE 4 3 × 2 0 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (ix) H T HE 27 × 2 6 ____________ ____________ ____________ (X) H T HE 2 4 × 1 1 ____________ ____________ ____________
 (xi) H T HE 1 6 × 5 0 ____________ ____________ ____________ (xii) H T HE 1 6 × 1 2 ____________ ____________ ____________

3. Make the next Sums in your pocket book:

(i) 18×17

(ii) 28×16

(iii) 44×14

(iv) 61×15

(v) 73×17

(vi) 63×35

(vii) 93×18

(viii) 42×23

(ix) 45×29

(x) 47×32

(xi) 19×38

(xii) 39×28

(xiii) 41×41

(xiv) 88×42

(xv) 17×43

(xvi) 12×62

(xvii) 23 × 25

(xviii) 10×45

(xix) 33×71

(xx) 27×82

(xxi) 27×82

(xxii) 44×87

(xxiii) 21×91

(xxiv) 31×92